Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Enforcement Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Mizeur, Barkley, Barnes, Bobo, Braveboy, Cane, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Hubbard, Hucker, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, V. Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Labor and Industry in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to collect and retain a specified civil penalty rather than have the penalty paid into the General Fund; requiring a contractor to pay specified liquidated damages for late submission of payroll records to the Division and not to the General Fund; requiring a contractor to pay specified liquidated damages for failing to pay a specified laborer or employee the prevailing wage to the Division and not to the General Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0948 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-219, 17-220, 17-221, 17-222, 17-224 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM