Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools - Requirement to Demolish Closed Schools
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to demolish closed public school buildings in Baltimore City within 3 years after the date the school was closed unless the school building has been reopened, transferred, sold, or disposed of in another manner.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
(   4-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page