Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Public School Construction Fee and Fund - Authority to Establish and Administer PG 402-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Prince George's County Council to enact specified laws or ordinances to establish and collect a public school construction fee to be paid by business establishments located in the county and to establish and administer a public school construction trust fund; requiring a law or an ordinance enacted by the County Council under the Act to require that the fees collected under the law or ordinance be deposited in the trust fund and used only for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM