Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Fraser-Hidalgo, and Frush
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Beidle)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making the failure to wear a seat belt in a rear passenger seat of a motor vehicle a primary offense rather than a secondary offense; requiring a specified motor vehicle passenger in a front seat position that is not adjacent to a door of a motor vehicle to be restrained by a seat belt; and requiring the Police Training and Standards Commission to report to the General Assembly by December 31, 2019 traffic stop data comparing current traffic stops with traffic stops conducted in the two years prior to the Act taking effect.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0373 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Beidle) Adopted 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-412.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM