Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Cullison, Gutierrez, A. Kelly, S. Robinson, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to claim a specified credit against the State income tax for specified driver education costs paid for a child, stepchild, or legal ward who is eligible to receive free meals at school; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to assess specified fees on specified licensees convicted of specified driving offenses; establishing the Driver's Education Fund to pay for the tax credit under the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0777
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1336 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
(   12-120, 16-1001 through 16-1003 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM