Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosed Property Registry - Notification to Local Jurisdictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Long, Cluster, Grammer, Lam, Metzgar, and O'Donnell
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information that is required to be contained in the initial registration of a residential property in the Foreclosed Property Registry in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to include the county in which the property is located; and requiring the Department to promptly send an electronic copy of the initial registration of a residential property to the appropriate county official and, on request, to the appropriate official of the municipal corporation in which the residential property is located.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/14/2016 Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-126.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM