Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Love and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program to provide competitive grants to county school boards for equipping school vehicles with three-point seat belts; providing that the goal of the program is to determine the feasibility and desirability of equipping school vehicles with three-point seat belts; requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation to implement and administer the pilot program; requiring the Department to solicit applications from county school boards for grants to defray certain costs of the program; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts - Pilot Program
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-412.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM