Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Suspensions and Expulsions - Restrictions and Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, and B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a principal of a public school or a county superintendent from suspending a student under the age of 10 years; and prohibiting a principal or a county superintendent from instituting an out-of-school suspension unless alternative disciplinary methods or in-school suspensions failed to correct a student's behavior.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM