Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission and Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the composition of the Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission and the Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission; requiring the Governor, with the advice of the Secretary of Natural Resources, to appoint a representative of the aquaculture industry in the State to both the Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission and the Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission; providing for the terms of the membership of the Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission and the Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (137-1)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690116/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-9)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {593427/1 Rejected (13-33)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (137-1) 43A
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 43A
House 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {690116/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (128-9) 57
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 54
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2015 4/02/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {593427/1 Rejected (13-33) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-102, 4-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM