Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Healthy Kids Award Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes and Carter
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Healthy Kids Award Program; requiring the State Department of Education, after consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to develop and implement the Program; and specifying the purpose of the Program.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-409.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM