Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsored by
Delegate Frank
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a hearing of charges filed by specified health occupations boards from being stayed or challenged by specified procedural defects; prohibiting an order of specified health occupations boards from being stayed pending judicial review; altering the circumstances under which an order of specified health occupations boards may not be stayed; repealing obsolete provisions of law regarding the stay of orders of specified health occupations boards; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0837
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-316, 10-317, 11-315, 11-317, 11-318, 13-317, 13-318, 16-313, 16-315, 17-511, 19-312, 19-313, 1A-310, 1A-311, 20-314, 20-315, 2-315, 2-316, 3-315, 3-316, 4-318, 4-319, 5-312, 5-313, 7-319, 7-320, 9-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM