Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes and Barve
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain owners of qualified developments of low income housing to claim a credit against the State income tax; prohibiting a credit in a taxable year from exceeding the owner's State income tax for the taxable year; prohibiting credits claimed by owners of a pass-through entity from exceeding a certain amount; allowing unused credits to be claimed in subsequent taxable years under certain circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Housing and Community Development to approve certain applications; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM