Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medicaid Managed Care Organizations - Enrollees Access to Pharmacy Services (Any Willing Pharmacy)
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the program under which Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients are required to enroll in managed care organizations to ensure that enrollees may elect to receive pharmacy services at a site in the pharmacy provider network of any managed care organization; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (136-0) 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2015 4/02/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM