Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exemption for Hospitals Providing Hospice Program Services
Sponsored by
Delegate Morgan
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "health care facility" to exempt from the certificate of need requirements hospitals that are providing certain hospice program services to patients admitted to the hospital.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exemption for Hospitals Providing Hospice Program Services
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page