Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Anderson, Barkley, Braveboy, Clagett, Clippinger, Conaway, Costa, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Glenn, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haynes, Healey, Howard, Hucker, Kramer, Lee, McHale, Mizeur, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Stukes, Swain, V. Turner, Vaughn, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing collective bargaining rights for specified employees of the District Court of Maryland; establishing a State Judicial Employees Labor Relations Board as an independent unit of State government; providing for the staggering of terms of the members of the Board; requiring the Board to recognize one statewide bargaining unit; providing that the Judiciary has the right to determine specified budgetary, employment, and personnel practices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0824
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264960/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Norman) Withdrawn
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Norman) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Norman) {143627/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Norman) {433725/1 Rejected (43-87)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {763924/1 Rejected
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-46)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {264960/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Norman) Withdrawn 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate Norman) Adopted 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Norman) {143627/1 Adopted 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Norman) {433725/1 Rejected (43-87) 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Barkley) {763924/1 Rejected 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/17/2014 3/14/2014 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted 50
House 3/17/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (90-46) 50
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM