Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsored by
Delegates West, Mautz, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, and Kelly
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a dental practice to be owned, managed, or operated by a licensed dentist; authorizing, under specified circumstances, an heir of a licensed dentist who was the owner of a dental practice to serve as an owner of the dental practice for up to 1 year; authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to extend the 1-year time period under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board to take specified action against specified applicants and licensees for accepting or tendering rebates or split fees; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017, July 1, 2018, July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-102, 4-103, 4-301, 4-315, 4-321, 4-601, 4-602, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM