Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Dumais, Glass, Oaks, Valderrama, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child, or the District Court at a bail review or preliminary hearing, to order a child to be held in a secure juvenile facility pending a transfer determination except under specified circumstances; and requiring the District Court at a bail review or preliminary hearing to order that a specified study be made under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0757
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM