Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nonviolent Convictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Carter
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for expungement of a specified record if the person was convicted of a nonviolent crime; specifying that a petition for expungement under the Act may not be filed before satisfactory completion of the sentence, including probation; providing that a determination as to whether a person is entitled to expungement under the Act is within the discretion of the court; requiring the court to take into consideration the circumstances of the case and of the petitioner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1058 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM