Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Glenn, B. Robinson, and Stukes
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that prohibits a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child to transfer the case to the juvenile court under specified circumstances; prohibiting the court from transferring a case to juvenile court if the child was convicted in an unrelated case excluded from juvenile court jurisdiction or the alleged crime is murder in the first degree and the accused child was 16 or 17 years of age when the alleged crime was committed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0515
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (72-61)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {358974/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-44)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (72-61) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 45
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {358974/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (90-44) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-202, 4-202.1, 4-202.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM