Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Construction – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Acevero, Bridges, Charkoudian, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Lehman, Love, Stein, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, beginning July 1, 2021, the Interagency Commission on School Construction from approving a public school construction project for a school district that has not adopted or updated a certain school district energy policy; specifying the contents of a school district energy policy; encouraging school districts to set certain targets in their school district energy policy; requiring that a school district energy policy be posted on the school district's website and updated every 2 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public School Construction – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-312.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:28 PM