Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison and Frank
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Physicians to issue a cease and desist order or obtain injunctive relief against an individual for taking any action for which the Board determines there is a preponderance of evidence of grounds for discipline under a specified provision of law and that poses a serious risk to the health, safety, and welfare of a patient; repealing the authority for specified persons to appeal specified decisions to the Board of Review, followed by a specified appeal; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0981
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {356680/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {356680/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {484734/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 63
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-206, 14-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM