Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Review and Reporting of Possible Misuse or Abuse of Monitored Prescription Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates Kach, Olszewski, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Hammen, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for a specified purpose and report possible misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug to a prescriber or dispenser; requiring the Program, before the Program reports the possible misuse or abuse, to obtain clinical guidance and interpretation from the technical advisory committee to the Program; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756880/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {756880/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2A-02, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM