Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent Registration
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Hornberger, McDonough, and Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a one-time, permanent registration for a Class G (trailer) vehicle when requested by the owner; establishing a fee schedule for the permanent registration of a Class G (trailer) vehicle according to the gross weight of the vehicle; establishing that a registration issued under the Act is not transferable; and establishing that a vehicle registered under the Act may not be used for hire except to haul farm products or in any manner other than as a farm trailer or semitrailer.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1627 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent Registration
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-927, 13-930 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM