Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County and St. Mary's County - Task Force to Study the Use and Trade of Illicit Opioids in Traditionally Rural Counties
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Fisher, Proctor, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Use and Trade of Illicit Opioids in Traditionally Rural Counties; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a Task Force member from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to conduct a specified assessment and make recommendations regarding specified matters; providing for the termination of the Act at the end of June 30, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM