Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Gutierrez, C. Howard, McComas, Turner, Valderrama, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain social worker, nurse, nurse practitioner, physician's assistant, or physician review and sign a certain discharge plan for a resident of a nursing facility before the nursing facility discharges the resident.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Nursing Facilities - Discharge Plans - Review and Signature Requirement
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-345.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM