Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Visually Impaired Students - Orientation and Mobility Evaluation
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington, Braveboy, George, Howard, Ivey, A. Kelly, Valderrama, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local school system to evaluate the orientation and mobility skills of a child who is visually impaired during an initial evaluation and any reevaluation for the determination of a child's eligibility for an individualized education program; requiring an orientation and mobility evaluation to be conducted in a specified manner; requiring any determinations or recommendations regarding the orientation and mobility skills of a child who is visually impaired to be included in the child's individualized education program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM