Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Howard, Aumann, Beidle, Fennell, Gilchrist, McConkey, O'Donnell, Pendergrass, S. Robinson, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums; providing that the purpose of the Task Force is to study long term care insurance enrollment in the State and consider methods to increase enrollment in long-term care insurance; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and proposed legislation to address enrollment in long-term care insurance to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0896
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0822 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795763/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {795763/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM