Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credits – Poultry Houses – LED Lighting
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderton, Adams, Afzali, Carozza, Cassilly, Chang, Corderman, Glass, Hornberger, Jalisi, Kittleman, Long, Mautz, McComas, W. Miller, Rose, Sample-Hughes, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual a credit against the State income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred to purchase and install certain lighting systems on certain poultry houses; providing that the credit may not exceed the lesser of $5,000 or the individual's State income tax liability; prohibiting the carrying forward of any unused credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017, but before January 1, 2023; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credits – Poultry Houses – LED Lighting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credits – Poultry Houses – LED Lighting
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM