Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Dumais, Atterbeary, Barve, Frush, Gutierrez, Jones, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Tarlau, A. Washington, Moon, Korman, Stein, Wilkins, Gilchrist, Jackson, Beidle, Hettleman, Frick, Lierman, Lam, P. Young, Ciliberti, A. Miller, and B. Barnes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain individuals to file a petition for an extreme risk protective order with a certain court or a District Commissioner under certain circumstances; requiring a petition for an extreme risk protective order to contain certain information on the present danger including the number, types, and location of any known firearms in possession of the respondent; authorizing a judge to enter an interim extreme risk protective order to require the respondent to surrender any firearm in the respondent's possession; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {822614/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {793824/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (46-88)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {293929/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-85)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {903725/3 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Extreme Risk Prevention Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-17)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {258778/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {403520/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (31-13)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Morhaim and Corderman)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Morhaim and Corderman)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (87-50)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-46)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Violence - Seizure of Lethal Weapons - Lethal Violence Protective Order
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {822614/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 44
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {793824/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (46-88) 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {293929/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-85) 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {903725/3 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Safety - Extreme Risk Prevention Orders
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (116-17) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {258778/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {403520/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (31-13) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Morhaim and Corderman) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Dumais, Morhaim and Corderman) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Fisher) Adopted 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted (87-50) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (93-46) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109, 9-109.1, 9-121 )
(   5-601 through 5-610 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM