Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a trustee to invest money of a trust account for a pre-need contract in specified securities; and requiring the income of the trust account to remain in the trust account, be reinvested and compounded, and be disbursed only for payment of specified fees, commissions, and other costs of the trust account.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0751
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM