Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unincorporated Nonprofit Associations - Members and Officers - Personal Liability
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified member of an unincorporated nonprofit association from being sued for specified debts, obligations, or other liabilities of the unincorporated nonprofit association; prohibiting an officer or a director of an unincorporated nonprofit association from being sued for specified debts, obligations, or other liabilities of the unincorporated nonprofit association under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM