Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Education - Consolidated and Coordinated Procurement PG 405-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education and the County Executive of Prince George's County to review procurement policies and practices to determine whether areas of duplication ought to be consolidated and coordinated; requiring the county board and the County Executive jointly to submit a specified annual report concerning procurements to the General Assembly and the Prince George's County Delegation; specifying information to be included in the report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Details
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1008 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM