Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Applicants for Employment - Criminal History Records Check - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Jacobs, and Otto
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting specified positions in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene from a provision of law that prohibits specified appointing authorities in State government from inquiring into the criminal record or criminal history of an applicant for employment until the applicant has been provided an opportunity for an interview.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 61
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM