Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Fennell, Hixson, Kelly, Shoemaker, Tarlau, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish the Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program on or before July 1, 2018; specifying the purpose of the Program; specifying qualifications and application procedures for a certificate; requiring the Department to issue a certificate to any applicant who meets specified requirements; authorizing an applicant to petition for judicial review of a decision of the Department that relates to issuing or renewing a certificate; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-420 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM