Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate McCray
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development by October 1, 2018, to adopt by regulation a specified statewide building code relating to specified buildings constructed with or being constructed by specified light frame combustible construction; establishing requirements for the construction of specified buildings; prohibiting a specified construction project from using a specified type of construction to proceed unless a specified fire watch warden is present; establishing qualifications and responsibilities; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0722
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1201 through 12-1206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM