Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council)
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Parole and Probation to conduct a specified risk and needs assessment on specified inmates and include the results in a specified case record; altering the manner in which specified diminution credits may be earned; requiring the Division to impose specified graduated sanctions; establishing the Addiction Treatment Divestiture Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; establishing the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board and the Local Government Justice Reinvestment Commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1005
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {622316/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {803621/2 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {433727/1 Rejected (45-86)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McKay) {913623/1 Rejected (48-78)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {423026/6 Rejected (49-82)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {423026/7 Rejected (45-84)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {983121/1 Adopted (112-19)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {333725/1 Rejected (51-78)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {183121/1 Rejected (49-81)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {733020/2 Rejected (47-80)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {863725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {823222/2 Rejected (53-79)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-31)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {622316/1 Adopted 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 58A
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {803621/2 Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {433727/1 Rejected (45-86) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate McKay) {913623/1 Rejected (48-78) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {423026/6 Rejected (49-82) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {423026/7 Rejected (45-84) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate C. Wilson) {983121/1 Adopted (112-19) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {333725/1 Rejected (51-78) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {183121/1 Rejected (49-81) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {733020/2 Rejected (47-80) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {863725/1 Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {823222/2 Rejected (53-79) 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (105-31) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Carozza) {183121/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Folden) {333725/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate McDonough) {423026/06 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate McDonough) {423026/07 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Krebs) {433727/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments House - (Judiciary) {622316/01 Adopted
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Folden) {733020/02 Incomplete
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Krebs) {803621/02 Adopted
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Shoemaker) {823222/02 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Dumais) {863725/01 Adopted
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate McKay) {913623/01 Rejected
4/01/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Wilson, C.) {983121/01 Adopted
2/12/2016 Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act
4/04/2016 Text - Third - Justice Reinvestment Act
3/31/2016 Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) {433727/1 Rejected (45-86) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McKay) {913623/1 Rejected (48-78) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDonough) {423026/6 Rejected (49-82) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDonough) {423026/7 Rejected (45-84) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (C. Wilson) {983121/1 Adopted (112-19) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Folder) {333725/1 Rejected (51-78) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Carozza) {183121/1 Rejected (49-81) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Folder) {733020/2 Rejected (47-80) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Shoemaker) {823222/2 Rejected (53-79) - 03/27/16
3/28/2016 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-31) - 03/28/16
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-504, 11-604, 3-601, 3-704, 3-705, 3-706, 3-707, 3-708, 6-101, 6-104, 6-111, 6-117, 6-119, 6-120, 6-121, 7-101, 7-103, 7-104, 7-205, 7-301, 7-301.1, 7-305, 7-309, 7-401, 7-504, 9-402, 9-614 )
(   1-101, 11-819, 6-223, 6-224 )
(   14-101, 3-601, 5-601, 5-602 through 5-606, 5-607, 5-608, 5-609, 5-609.1, 5-612, 5-905, 7-104, 7-108, 8-106, 8-206, 8-207, 8-209, 8-301, 8-516, 8-611, 8-801, 9-801 through 9-805, 9-807 )
(   8-507, 8-6D-01 )
(   1-601 through 1-605 )
(   9-3201 through 9-3212 )
(   27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM