Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Mobile Integrated Health Care Services - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Rudolph
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems (MIEMSS) to conduct a study on the potential for development of mobile integrated health care services in the State; requiring MIEMSS to submit specified reports to the General Assembly on or before specified dates; and providing for the termination of the Act at the end of June 30, 2016.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM