Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Correctional Facilities - Prerelease and Work Release Programs - Assessment of Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Anderson, Conaway, Gibson, Glenn, McCray, Proctor, and Queen
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the assessment of a certain fee to a certain person participating in certain prerelease and work release programs at a local correctional facility; repealing the authorization for a certain administrator of a correctional facility in Anne Arundel County to charge a certain fee; repealing the authorization for the Sheriff in Washington County to charge a certain fee; and providing for the construction of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Local Correctional Facilities - Prerelease and Work Release Programs - Assessment of Fees
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-604, 11-703, 11-723 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM