Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Awards of Certain Fees and Costs and Prohibition Against Retaliation
Sponsored by
Delegate Hucker
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the court, on a specified finding in an action on behalf of an employee for a violation of the Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law, to award the Attorney General reasonable counsel fees and other costs; authorizing the court, on a specified finding in an action by an employee for a violation of the Wage Payment and Collection Law, to award the employee reasonable counsel fees and other costs; prohibiting an employer from taking specified adverse action against an employee under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343791/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-36)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {427775/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (35-11)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Senators Astle, Klausmeier, and Kittleman
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {343791/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (98-36) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {427775/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (35-11) 64
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senate Refuses to Recede 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Senators Astle, Klausmeier, and Kittleman 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-507, 3-507.2, 3-507.3, 3-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM