Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a social media website from taking certain actions to censor the religious speech or political speech of a certain user; authorizing the Attorney General to bring a certain civil cause of action under certain circumstances; authorizing a court to award certain court costs and attorney's fees to the prevailing party of a certain action; providing that a certain violation of the Act is an unfair and deceptive trade practice that is subject to certain penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-1001 through 19-1006 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page