Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Sale of Drug Paraphernalia to a Minor - Local Law Authorizing Business License Revocation for a Second or Subsequent Violation
Sponsored by
Delegates Swain, Barkley, Bobo, Burns, Dwyer, George, Glenn, Harper, Healey, McDonough, Pena-Melnyk, Stocksdale, V. Turner, Vaughn, Weir, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to adopt a local law that authorizes the county or municipal corporation to revoke or not to renew the business license of an establishment for the second or subsequent conviction of an employee of the establishment if the violation involves selling or delivering drug paraphernalia to a minor and occurs on the property of the business establishment.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0043
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM