Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Bohanan, and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Technology Internship Program; establishing the purposes of the Program; requiring the University of Maryland, Baltimore County (UMBC) to administer the Program and undertake specified activities to carry out the purposes of the Program; establishing specified eligibility requirements for participation in the Program; requiring UMBC to prepare a specified annual report; requiring the Governor to include funds in the State budget for reimbursement of intern stipends and other specified purposes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894469/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-7)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174333/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {894469/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-7) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {174333/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3001 through 18-3010 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM