Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Acquittal, Dismissal, and Nolle Prosequi
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Morales, Adams, Barron, Branch, Carozza, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, Hayes, Moon, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Sydnor, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, M. Washington, West, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who has been charged with the commission of a crime is entitled to automatic expungement of specified records relating to the matter if the person is acquitted, the charge is dismissed, or a specified nolle prosequi is entered; requiring a court to take specified actions within 60 days after a disposition of a charge that is required to be expunged under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM