Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Vehicles Valued as Stock in Business - Alteration of Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 50% to 100% a certain property tax credit that the governing body of a county or municipal corporation is required to grant against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on vehicles valued as stock in business beginning on July 1, 2016; and applying the Act retroactively to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0478
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Property Tax - Vehicles Valued as Stock in Business - Alteration of Tax Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM