Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Anderson, Braveboy, Carter, Conaway, Glenn, Harper, Haynes, Holmes, A. Miller, Pena-Melnyk, Stukes, Summers, Swain, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation, the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs, and the Public Service Commission to collect specified data regarding specified minority business enterprise participation with specified electricity suppliers from specified electricity suppliers that have entered into a specified memorandum of understanding; altering the date by which specified persons must submit a specified report to the General Assembly; and altering the termination of a specified Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0972
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1063 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM