Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public service company from terminating electric or gas service to certain residential customers for nonpayment on a day that a government furlough is in effect or for 7 days after the furlough has ended; authorizing the Public Service Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring a certain court to stay certain proceedings for the foreclosure or repossession of certain residential property for a certain period of time under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0512
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 8-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM