Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Mizeur, Braveboy, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Gaines, Glass, Haynes, Howard, Hubbard, Jameson, A. Kelly, A. Miller, Oaks, Stukes, Valderrama, Vaughn, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "secured party" for purposes of provisions of law governing actions to foreclose specified mortgages and deeds of trust; and prohibiting a lender who forecloses on a specified mortgage or deed of trust from filing a motion for a deficiency judgment if specified proceeds are insufficient to satisfy the debt and accrued interest.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 7-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM