Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Anderson, Anderton, Aumann, Barve, Beidle, Carr, Cassilly, Flanagan, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Healey, Hill, Holmes, Jacobs, Knotts, Lafferty, Lam, McCray, McMillan, Morhaim, Otto, S. Robinson, Saab, Stein, West, Wivell, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Miele, Morgan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to proclaim annually the second week in June as Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and environmental organizations, including the Chesapeake Bay Foundation, the Alliance for the Chesapeake Bay, the Choose Clean Water Coalition, and the Chesapeake Bay Commercial Fishermen's Association, to properly observe Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week with specified events, activities, and programs.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0620
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {386885/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {386885/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM