Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderton, Adams, Mautz, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appoint five members of the Board of License Commissioners for Wicomico County; requiring that members of the Board be nominated in a certain manner; requiring that three members of the Board be residents of the City of Salisbury, nominated jointly by the County Executive and the Mayor of Salisbury; staggering the terms of member of the Board in a certain manner; and specifying the expiration of the terms of certain members of the Board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - City of Salisbury - Alcoholic Beverages - Local Regulation and Control
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823796/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - City of Salisbury - Alcoholic Beverages - Local Regulation and Control
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {823796/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Text - Chapter - Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
(   32-102, 32-201, 32-202 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page