Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Prohibition of Video Lottery Contributions - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker and Buckel
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition on applicants for a certain video lottery operation license, holders of a certain video lottery operation license, and persons who own an interest in the operation of a video lottery facility in the State from directly or indirectly making a contribution to campaign finance entities of a candidate for any nonfederal public office in the State or any other campaign finance entity organized in support of a candidate for any nonfederal public office in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Prohibition of Video Lottery Contributions - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Prohibition of Video Lottery Contributions - Repeal
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-237 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM